IA HF262 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 2:30PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 2:30PM RM G17.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 4.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 4.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 2:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Koelker, Lykam, and R. Smith. S.J. 52. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 8:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Johnson, and Lykam. S.J. 390. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 329. |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 88, nays 10. H.J. 324. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB4 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 213.
SSB1162 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Johnson and Lykam.
SSB1162 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Johnson and Lykam.