IA HF2589 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 730.) Effective date: 06/21/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023. Applicability date: 05/12/2022, 05/02/2022, 06/24/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 730.) Effective date: 06/21/2022, 07/01/2022, 01/01/2023. Applicability date: 05/12/2022, 05/02/2022, 06/24/2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-24 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–8386, as amended? (Y: 38 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-23HouseNOBA: Final
2022-06-21HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 946.
2022-06-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942.
2022-05-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 932.
2022-05-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 926.
2022-05-24SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 14. S.J. 926.
2022-05-24SenateSubstituted for SF 2384. S.J. 925.
2022-05-24SenateRead first time, attached to companion SF 2384. S.J. 925.
2022-05-24SenateMessage from House. S.J. 925.
2022-05-24HouseImmediate message. H.J. 927.
2022-06-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 942.
2022-05-27HouseNOBA: Senate Floor
2022-05-24HousePassed House, yeas 56, nays 39. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8398 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8397 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8396 filed, ruled out of order. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8394 filed, adopted. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8395 to amendment H-8394 filed, adopted. H.J. 926.
2022-05-24HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 925.
2022-05-24HouseMotion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8386, yeas 38, nays 56. H.J. 925.
2022-05-24HousePoint of order raised on amendment H-8386, ruled not germane. H.J. 924.
2022-05-24HouseAmendment H-8399 to H-8386 filed, adopted. H.J. 924.
2022-05-23HouseAmendment H-8386 filed. H.J. 904.
2022-05-23HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 889.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3162 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2384.
SF2384 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 926.
HSB730 (Related) 2022-05-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2589.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback