IA HF2563 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a work group relating to child fatality protocol and alleged child abuse. (Formerly HF 2296.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a work group relating to child fatality protocol and alleged child abuse. (Formerly HF 2296.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Costello, and Ragan. S.J. 613. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 590. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 590. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 547. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8063 adopted. H.J. 546. |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8063 filed. H.J. 447. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 372. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2296 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.