IA HF2558 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to higher education, including by modifying the responsibilities of private institutions of higher education, community colleges, the state board of regents, and institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents, modifying provisions related to diversity, equity, and inclusion policies, tuition, and administrator hiring at state universities, membership of the state board of regents, and student-employer work and tuition programs at state universities and community colleges, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2327.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to higher education, including by modifying the responsibilities of private institutions of higher education, community colleges, the state board of regents, and institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents, modifying provisions related to diversity, equity, and inclusion policies, tuition, and administrator hiring at state universities, membership of the state board of regents, and student-employer work and tuition programs at state universities and community colleges, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2327.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Quirmbach, and Rozenboom. S.J. 509. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 428. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 428. |
2024-02-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 481. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 497. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 56, nays 39. H.J. 459. |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8078 adopted, as amended. H.J. 459. |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8083 to amendment H-8078 out of order. H.J. 459. |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8090 to amendment H-8078 adopted. H.J. 459. |
2024-02-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendments H-8083 and H-8090 filed. H.J. 453. |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8078 filed. H.J. 428. |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 280. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2327 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.