IA HF2546 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of psychiatric intensive inpatient care under the Medicaid program. (Formerly HF 2125, HSB 530.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of psychiatric intensive inpatient care under the Medicaid program. (Formerly HF 2125, HSB 530.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 945. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-06-27 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 918. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 900. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 899. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2331. S.J. 899. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2331. S.J. 542. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 542. |
2022-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 581. |
2022-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 625. |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 571. |
2022-03-07 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 442. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB530 (Related) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2125.
HF2125 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
HF2125 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.