IA HF2515 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the licensure of marital and family therapists, mental health counselors, and social workers, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2343.) Effective date: 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the licensure of marital and family therapists, mental health counselors, and social workers, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2343.) Effective date: 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 927. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-04-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 779. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 815. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 815. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 524. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 2:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Salmon, and Weiner. S.J. 402. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 376. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 376. |
2024-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 380. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 379. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 265. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2343 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.