IA HF2513 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the Iowa sheep and wool promotion board to issue orders for the suspension and recommencement of the assessment imposed on wool, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 687.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the Iowa sheep and wool promotion board to issue orders for the suspension and recommencement of the assessment imposed on wool, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 687.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: McClintock, Green, and T. Taylor. S.J. 419. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 390. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 390. |
2024-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 397. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 390. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 265. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB687 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2513.