IA HF2500 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Fry, Brink and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 444.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee: Fry, Brink and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 444.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to Medicaid reimbursement for breast pumps and associated supplies. (Formerly HF 2215.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to Medicaid reimbursement for breast pumps and associated supplies. (Formerly HF 2215.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Brink and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 444. |
2020-02-26 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 332. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2128 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2319. S.J. 358.
HF2215 (Similar To) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 310.
SF2319 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Fiscal note.
HF2215 (Similar To) 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 310.
SF2319 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2500 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2500.html |