IA HF2483 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to interests in agricultural land acquired or held by foreign businesses, foreign governments, or nonresident aliens, or by agents, trustees, or fiduciaries thereof, by providing for registration and reporting requirements, providing for enforcement, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 663.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to interests in agricultural land acquired or held by foreign businesses, foreign governments, or nonresident aliens, or by agents, trustees, or fiduciaries thereof, by providing for registration and reporting requirements, providing for enforcement, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 663.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 397. |
2024-02-26 | House | SF 2204 substituted. H.J. 389. |
2024-02-26 | House | Amendment H-8019 withdrawn. H.J. 389. |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8019 filed. H.J. 318. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 253. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3113 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2204.
SF2204 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 781.
HSB663 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2483.
SF2204 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 781.
HSB663 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2483.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2483 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2483.html |