IA HF2473 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 907.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 907.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for fees, providing for legal responsibilities, and providing for regulatory requirements, taxation, and other properly related matters, and including penalties and effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for fees, providing for legal responsibilities, and providing for regulatory requirements, taxation, and other properly related matters, and including penalties and effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 907. |
2014-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 896. |
2014-05-09 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 896. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 890. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 915. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 915. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5209. S.J. 914. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5209. S.J. 913. |
2014-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 882. |
2014-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 57, nays 40. H.J. 882. |
2014-04-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8387, as amended. H.J. 881. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8389 to Senate amendment H-8387 adopted. H.J. 881. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8389 to Senate amendment H-8387 filed. H.J. 880. |
2014-04-30 | House | Senate amendment H-8387. H.J. 880. |
2014-04-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 874. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 904. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 904. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5196 as amended, adopted. S.J. 903. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5205, ruled out of order. S.J. 903. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5204 withdrawn. S.J. 903. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 902. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5203, ruled out of order. S.J. 902. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5202, ruled out of order. S.J. 902. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5200, ruled out of order. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5206, ruled out of order. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5201, ruled out of order. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5199 adopted. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5198, ruled out of order. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5197 withdrawn. S.J. 901. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendments S-5197, S-5198, S-5199, S-5200, S-5201, S-5202, S-5203, S-5204, S-5205, S-5206 filed. S.J. 901. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment S-5196 filed. S.J. 900. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 900. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 892. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 892. |
2014-04-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 860. |
2014-04-30 | House | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 44. H.J. 857. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8376, H-8377, H-8378, and H-8379 to amendment H-8315 out of order. H.J. 857. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8376, H-8377, H-8378, and H-8379 to amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 857. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8364, H-8365, H-8368, H-8371, H-8372, H-8373, and H-8374 to amendment H-8315 out of order. H.J. 857. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8364, H-8365, H-8368, H-8371, H-8372, H-8373, and H-8374 to amendment H-8315 filed. H.J. 857. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8329 and H-8330 to amendment H-8315 out of order. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8318, H-8322, H-8323, H-8324, H-8325, H-8326, and H-8328 to amendment H-8315 out of order. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8291, H-8292, H-8293, H-8297, H-8299, and H-8315 out of order. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8362 as amended, adopted. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8366 and H-8367 out of order. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendments H-8366 and H-8367 filed. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8363 to amendment H-8362 filed, adopted. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-30 | House | Amendment H-8362 filed. H.J. 856. |
2014-04-29 | House | Amendments H-8329 and H-8330 filed. H.J. 844. |
2014-04-28 | House | Amendment H-8328 filed. H.J. 833. |
2014-04-28 | House | Amendments H-8324, H-8325, and H-8326 filed. H.J. 832. |
2014-04-28 | House | Amendments H-8322 and H-8323 filed. H.J. 831. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendments H-8315 and H-8318 filed. H.J. 820. |
2014-04-23 | House | Amendments H-8297 and H-8299 filed. H.J. 792. |
2014-04-22 | House | Amendments H-8292 and H-8293 filed. H.J. 777. |
2014-04-22 | House | Amendment H-8291 filed. H.J. 776. |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 759. |