IA HF2472 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Pursuant to Rule 73.6, motion to reconsider failed. H.J. 890.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Pursuant to Rule 73.6, motion to reconsider failed. H.J. 890.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and providing for the facilitation of broadband access in unserved or underserved areas of the state, including income and property tax incentives for broadband infrastructure installation, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2329) (Formerly HSB 515)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and providing for the facilitation of broadband access in unserved or underserved areas of the state, including income and property tax incentives for broadband infrastructure installation, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2329) (Formerly HSB 515)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Pursuant to Rule 73.6, motion to reconsider failed. H.J. 890. |
2014-04-25 | House | Motion filed to reconsider vote on the bill by Upmeyer. H.J. 818. |
2014-04-25 | House | Failed to pass House, ayes 44, nays 51. H.J. 811. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendments H-8303 and H-8304 withdrawn. H.J. 811. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8309 lost. H.J. 811. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8310 adopted. H.J. 810. |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment H-8305 lost. H.J. 810. |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendments H-8303, H-8304, H-8305, H-8309, and H-8310 filed. H.J. 801. |
2014-04-23 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2014-04-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 759. |