IA HF2472 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 900.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 900.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act extending the period for determining the rates of the motor fuel tax based on calculating the distribution of ethanol blended gasoline and other motor fuel, and including effective date provisions. Effective 5-2-12.
Title
A bill for an act extending the period for determining the rates of the motor fuel tax based on calculating the distribution of ethanol blended gasoline and other motor fuel, and including effective date provisions. Effective 5-2-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 900. | |
2012-04-30 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. | |
2012-04-26 | Message from Senate. H.J. 892. | |
2012-04-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 866. | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays none. S.J. 865. | |
2012-04-26 | Substituted for Senate File 2340. S.J. 865. | |
2012-04-25 | Read first time and attached to companion Senate File 2340. S.J. 860. | |
2012-04-25 | Message from House. S.J. 860. | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 889. | |
2012-04-25 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 884. | |
2012-04-25 | Point ruled well taken. H.J. 884. | |
2012-04-25 | Point of order raised Rule 10. | |
2012-04-25 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 882. | |
2012-04-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 883. | |
2012-04-24 | Subcommittee, Paustian, Byrnes, and Muhlbauer. H.J. 879. | |
2012-04-19 | Introduced, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 858. |