IA HF2471 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the department of veterans affairs relating to membership on the commission of veterans affairs and expenditures from the veterans trust fund. (Formerly HF 2346 and HSB 538.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the department of veterans affairs relating to membership on the commission of veterans affairs and expenditures from the veterans trust fund. (Formerly HF 2346 and HSB 538.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 615. |
2018-03-19 | House | SF 2366 substituted. H.J. 603. |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 593. |
2018-03-12 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 551. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3021 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB538 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2346 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.
SF2366 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 860.
HSB538 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2346 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 615.
SF2366 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 860.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2471 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2471.html |