IA HF2468 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Amendment H-8211 filed. H.J. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Amendment H-8211 filed. H.J. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the mistreatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly HSB 608.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the mistreatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly HSB 608.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8211 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Cohoon and Holz. H.J. 442. |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 428. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB608 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2468 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2468.html |