IA HF2460 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to Iowa's urban renewal law and incremental taxes by modifying provisions relating to divisions of revenue, modifying provisions relating to the approval of urban renewal plans and projects and approval of the use of certain local sales and services tax revenue, requiring certain reporting and auditing, and including applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to Iowa's urban renewal law and incremental taxes by modifying provisions relating to divisions of revenue, modifying provisions relating to the approval of urban renewal plans and projects and approval of the use of certain local sales and services tax revenue, requiring certain reporting and auditing, and including applicability provisions. Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 963. | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 962. | |
2012-05-18 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 962. | |
2012-05-07 | Message from House. S.J. 899. | |
2012-05-07 | Immediate message. H.J. 913. | |
2012-05-08 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 941. | |
2012-05-07 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 911. | |
2012-05-07 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8509. H.J. 910. | |
2012-04-25 | Senate amendment H-8509 filed. H.J. 890. | |
2012-04-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 881. | |
2012-04-24 | Immediate message. S.J. 855. | |
2012-04-24 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 22. S.J. 854. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5220, as amended, adopted. S.J. 853. | |
2012-04-24 | Deferred. S.J. 853. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5233 filed, adopted. S.J. 852. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5232 filed, adopted. S.J. 852. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5225 ruled out of order. S.J. 852. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5230 filed, adopted. S.J. 851. | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment S-5231 filed, lost. S.J. 851. | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment S-5225 filed. S.J. 836. | |
2012-04-19 | Committe amendment S-5220 filed. S.J. 834. | |
2012-04-19 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 834. | |
2012-04-12 | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Bolkcom, and Feenstra. S.J. 793. | |
2012-04-11 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 772. | |
2012-04-11 | Message from House. S.J. 772. | |
2012-04-11 | Immediate message. H.J. 798. | |
2012-04-11 | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 43. H.J. 797. | |
2012-04-11 | Amendment H-8443 as amended, adopted. H.J. 797. | |
2012-04-11 | Amendment H-8452 filed, adopted. H.J. 796. | |
2012-04-11 | Amendment H-8450 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 796. | |
2012-04-10 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment H-8443 filed. H.J. 794. | |
2012-04-02 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 711. |