IA HF2456 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 710.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to behavioral health, including provisions relating to involuntary commitments and hospitalizations, the disclosure of mental health information to law enforcement professionals, and mental health and disability services. (Formerly HF 2327.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to behavioral health, including provisions relating to involuntary commitments and hospitalizations, the disclosure of mental health information to law enforcement professionals, and mental health and disability services. (Formerly HF 2327.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 710.
2018-03-27HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 689.
2018-03-27HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689.
2018-03-21HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 649.
2018-03-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 737.
2018-03-21SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 737.
2018-03-13SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 671.
2018-03-01SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Chelgren, Bolkcom, Costello, Ragan, and Segebart. S.J. 513.
2018-02-28SenateSubcommittee: Chelgren, Mathis, and Segebart. S.J. 499.
2018-02-27SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 464.
2018-02-27SenateMessage from House. S.J. 464.
2018-02-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 405.
2018-02-27HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 425.
2018-02-27HousePassed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 405.
2018-02-27HouseAmendment H-8118 withdrawn. H.J. 404.
2018-02-27HouseAmendment H-8102 adopted, as amended. H.J. 404.
2018-02-27HouseAmendment H-8121 to H-8102 adopted. H.J. 404.
2018-02-27HouseAmendment H-8117 withdrawn. H.J. 404.
2018-02-27HouseFiscal note.
2018-02-26HouseAmendments H-8102, H-8117, H-8118 and H-8121 filed. H.J. 395.
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 337.

Same As/Similar To

HF2327 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 425.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback