IA HF2452 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Allen, and Anderson. S.J. 782.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Allen, and Anderson. S.J. 782.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the individual income tax and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2174)
Title
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the individual income tax and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2174)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Allen, and Anderson. S.J. 782. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 764. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 764. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 91, nays 5. H.J. 706. |
2016-04-13 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-31 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 584. |