IA HF2450 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 901.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system and including effective date provisions. Item vetoed. Effective 7-1-14, with exception of Division I and section 19, effective 5-30-14, and section 18, effective 1-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system and including effective date provisions. Item vetoed. Effective 7-1-14, with exception of Division I and section 19, effective 5-30-14, and section 18, effective 1-1-15.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 901. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 895. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 895. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Chief Clerk's report on correction in enrollment. H.J. 831. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 807. |
2014-04-25 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 857. |
2014-04-25 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 20. S.J. 856. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted. S.J. 855. |
2014-04-25 | House | Message from House. S.J. 852. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. S.J. 851. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 799. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Explanation of vote. H.J. 818. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 796. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 796. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 795. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 792. |
2014-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 763. |
2014-04-16 | House | House conference committee appointed Worthan, Gustafson, Hess, T. Taylor, and Anderson. H.J. 760. |
2014-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 758. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 791. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Courtney, Hogg, Taylor, Garrett, and Chelgren. S.J. 790. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate insisted. S.J. 790. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 789. |
2014-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 740. |
2014-04-15 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendment H-8277. H.J. 740. |
2014-04-15 | House | Senate amendment H-8277. H.J. 739. |
2014-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 733. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 777. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 777. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5145 as amended, adopted. S.J. 776. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5147 lost. S.J. 775. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5151 adopted. S.J. 775. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5146 withdrawn. S.J. 775. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5148 adopted. S.J. 775. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-5151 filed. S.J. 770. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendments S-5146, S-5147, and S-5148 filed. S.J. 769. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-5145 filed. S.J. 753. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 753. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 697. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 697. |
2014-04-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 628. |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 52, nays 47. H.J. 617. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8197 adopted. H.J. 617. |
2014-04-01 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8179, as amended. H.J. 616. |
2014-04-01 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8179, as amended, not germane. H.J. 616. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8200 to amendment H-8179 filed, adopted. H.J. 615. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8192 as amended, lost. H.J. 615. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8202 to amendment H-8192 adopted. H.J. 615. |
2014-04-01 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent to reconsider amendment H-8202 to amendment H-8192. H.J. 615. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8202 to amendment H-8192 filed, lost. H.J. 615. |
2014-04-01 | House | Amendment H-8168 lost. H.J. 615. |
2014-03-31 | House | Amendments H-8179, H-8192, and H-8197 filed. H.J. 611. |
2014-03-26 | House | Amendment H-8168 filed. H.J. 604. |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 556. |