IA HF2445 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 972.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 972.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision and administration of mental health, disability, and homemaker-home health aide services and the responsibility for other health-related services. (Formerly HSB 631.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision and administration of mental health, disability, and homemaker-home health aide services and the responsibility for other health-related services. (Formerly HSB 631.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 972. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 949. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 963. |
2018-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 812. |
2018-04-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 811. |
2018-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8353. H.J. 810. |
2018-04-03 | House | Senate amendment H-8353 filed. H.J. 734. |
2018-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 729. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 858. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 856. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5160 adopted. S.J. 856. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5160 filed. S.J. 695. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 695. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Greene, and Ragan. S.J. 651. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 622. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 622. |
2018-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 544. |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 335. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB631 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.