IA HF2445 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act excluding certain promotional play receipts from the definition of adjusted gross receipts for purposes of the wagering tax on gambling games and relating to other matters involving gambling games regulation. Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act excluding certain promotional play receipts from the definition of adjusted gross receipts for purposes of the wagering tax on gambling games and relating to other matters involving gambling games regulation. Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - Passed House (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 722. |
2016-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 701. |
2016-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 673. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 735. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 38, nays 12. S.J. 734. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5141 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 734. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 708. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Returned to committee. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Allen, Behn, and Dotzler. S.J. 648. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 619. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 619. |
2016-04-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 590. |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 73, nays 23. H.J. 590. |
2016-03-29 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 554. |