IA HF2431 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of home-based businesses, including food establishments and home food processing establishments, and providing civil penalties. (Formerly HF 2005.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of home-based businesses, including food establishments and home food processing establishments, and providing civil penalties. (Formerly HF 2005.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 944. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-06-27 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 923. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 919. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 15. S.J. 919. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5174 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 918. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 545. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Johnson. S.J. 507. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 499. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 499. |
2022-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 542. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 66, nays 25. H.J. 533. |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendments H-8148 and H-8149 adopted. H.J. 533. |
2022-03-07 | House | Amendments H-8148 and H-8149 filed. H.J. 505. |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 269. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2005 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.