IA HF2424 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 594.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 594.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tax return preparers. (Formerly HSB 590.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tax return preparers. (Formerly HSB 590.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to State Government. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 312. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB590 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB3151 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Edler, and Jochum.
SSB3151 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Edler, and Jochum.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2424 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2424.html |