IA HF241 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adoption of a statement of free expression by the board of regents prior to the commencement of the fall 2019 academic calendar year.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adoption of a statement of free expression by the board of regents prior to the commencement of the fall 2019 academic calendar year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Gassman and Staed. H.J. 252. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 216. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF241 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF241.html |