IA HF2407 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a rural attorney recruitment assistance program, and making appropriations.(See HF 2689.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a rural attorney recruitment assistance program, and making appropriations.(See HF 2689.)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Lohse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 792. |
2024-04-10 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2689. |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 737. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/07/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Bagniewski and Collins. H.J. 451. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 227. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2689 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 837.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2407 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2407.html |