IA HF2401 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting persons from opening or using a credit card in the name of a minor without the consent of the minor's parent, guardian, or legal custodian, and providing criminal penalties. Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting persons from opening or using a credit card in the name of a minor without the consent of the minor's parent, guardian, or legal custodian, and providing criminal penalties. Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 585. |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 490. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 552. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 551. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 465. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Courtney, Allen, et al. S.J. 464. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee, Courtney, Anderson, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 456. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 430. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 430. |
2016-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 397. |
2016-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 427. |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 391. |
2016-03-02 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 287. |