IA HF2378 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pari-mutuel wagering, concerning distribution of horse racing purse moneys and establishing a fund for certain race horse organizations. (Formerly HSB 641.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pari-mutuel wagering, concerning distribution of horse racing purse moneys and establishing a fund for certain race horse organizations. (Formerly HSB 641.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 869. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 868. |
2022-04-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 828. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 745. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 2. S.J. 741. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 549. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2022 1:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 401. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 390. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 390. |
2022-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 385. |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment H-8061 withdrawn. H.J. 385. |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment H-8061 filed. H.J. 348. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 239. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB641 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2378.