IA HF2372 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning county supervisor representation and districting plans and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 625.) Effective 5-16-18.
Title
A bill for an act concerning county supervisor representation and districting plans and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 625.) Effective 5-16-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 997. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 996. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 966. |
2018-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 822. |
2018-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 824. |
2018-04-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 41. H.J. 821. |
2018-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8370. H.J. 820. |
2018-04-05 | House | Senate amendment H-8370 filed. H.J. 753. |
2018-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 751. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 882. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 20. S.J. 882. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendments S-5170 and S-5205 withdrawn. S.J. 881. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendments S-5171, S-5203, and S-5204 out of order. S.J. 881. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5226 filed, adopted. S.J. 881. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5221 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 881. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5208 withdrawn. S.J. 881. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2320. S.J. 880. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-5208 filed. S.J. 845. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Amendment S-5205 filed. S.J. 823. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Amendments S-5203 and S-5204 filed. S.J. 816. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Amendments S-5170 and S-5171 filed. S.J. 726. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 2320. S.J. 597. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 597. |
2018-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 512. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-08 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 548. |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 58 nays 38. H.J. 512. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8144 out of order. H.J. 511. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8116 adopted, as amended. H.J. 511. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8219 to H-8116 filed, adopted. H.J. 510. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8210 to H-8116 filed, adopted. H.J. 510. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8193 to H-8116 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 510. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8192 to H-8116 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 510. |
2018-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8144 filed. H.J. 431. |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment H-8116 filed. H.J. 395. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 278. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB625 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.