IA HF2370 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the supervision of orthotist or prosthetist assistants. Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the supervision of orthotist or prosthetist assistants. Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 602. |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 565. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 565. |
2014-03-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 508. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 603. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays none. S.J. 602. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 559. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee, Danielson, Bowman, and Chapman. S.J. 535. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 458. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 458. |
2014-03-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 411. |
2014-03-04 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 416. |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 408. |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 304. |