IA HF2366 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to out-of-state drug rehabilitation programs for certain bailable defendants and parolees. (Formerly HSB 607.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to out-of-state drug rehabilitation programs for certain bailable defendants and parolees. (Formerly HSB 607.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 271. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB607 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:30AM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2366 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2366.html |