IA HF2365 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Subcommittee, Dearden, Brase, and Rozenboom. S.J. 436.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Subcommittee, Dearden, Brase, and Rozenboom. S.J. 436.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act waiving certain hunter education requirements for residents who are active duty military personnel or honorably discharged veterans. (Formerly HSB 582)
Title
A bill for an act waiving certain hunter education requirements for residents who are active duty military personnel or honorably discharged veterans. (Formerly HSB 582)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dearden, Brase, and Rozenboom. S.J. 436. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 415. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 415. |
2016-03-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 374. |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 72, nays 26. H.J. 367. |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 267. |