IA HF2356 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to agreements between individuals and health care professionals for the provision of certain primary care health services for a service charge that covers an agreed upon period of time. (Formerly HF 2275.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to agreements between individuals and health care professionals for the provision of certain primary care health services for a service charge that covers an agreed upon period of time. (Formerly HF 2275.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 700.
2018-03-27HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689.
2018-03-21HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 648.
2018-03-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 737.
2018-03-21SenatePassed Senate, ayes 47, nays 2. S.J. 734.
2018-03-13SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 670.
2018-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Chapman, and Ragan. S.J. 476.
2018-02-26SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 431.
2018-02-26SenateMessage from House. S.J. 431.
2018-02-22HouseImmediate message. H.J. 371.
2018-02-22HousePassed House, ayes 94, nays 1. H.J. 368.
2018-02-22HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 367.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 367.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8075. H.J. 366.
2018-02-22HousePoint of order raised on H-8075, ruled not germane. H.J. 366.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 366.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8073. H.J. 365.
2018-02-22HousePoint of order raised on H-8073, ruled not germane. H.J. 365.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 364.
2018-02-22HouseMotion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8072. H.J. 364.
2018-02-22HousePoint of order raised on H-8072, ruled not germane. H.J. 363.
2018-02-22HouseAmendment H-8071 lost, as amended. H.J. 363.
2018-02-22HouseAmendment H-8084 to H-8071 filed, adopted. H.J. 362.
2018-02-21HouseAmendments H-8071, H-8072, H-8073 and H-8075 filed. H.J. 353.
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 270.

Same As/Similar To

HF2275 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 371.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback