IA HF2345 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Amendment S-5117 filed. S.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Amendment S-5117 filed. S.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the factors considered by the court in a determination of the best interest of the child in custody arrangements. (Formerly HF 2076)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the factors considered by the court in a determination of the best interest of the child in custody arrangements. (Formerly HF 2076)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Amendment S-5117 filed. S.J. 645. | |
2012-03-14 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 563. | |
2012-03-07 | Subcommittee, Dotzler, Mathis, and Whitver. S.J. 490. | |
2012-03-07 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 483. | |
2012-03-07 | Message from House. S.J. 483. | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate message. H.J. 457. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 444. | |
2012-03-06 | Pursuant to Rule 31, timely filing of amendments, H-8112 out of order. H.J. 444. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment H-8112 filed. H.J. 444. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 306. |