IA HF2337 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to franchisor-franchisee relationships for the purposes of certain employment laws and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 559.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to franchisor-franchisee relationships for the purposes of certain employment laws and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 559.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Commerce. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB559 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2018 9:00AM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2337 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2337.html |