IA HF2324 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a satellite internet grant program.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a satellite internet grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 12:30PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Brink and Williams. H.J. 257. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Information Technology. H.J. 218. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2324 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2324.html |