IA HF2324 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Deferred. S.J. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Deferred. S.J. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for a computer science advisory council to be convened by the director of the department of education. (Formerly HSB 603)
Title
A bill for an act providing for a computer science advisory council to be convened by the director of the department of education. (Formerly HSB 603)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 574. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5099 to S-5077 filed. S.J. 574. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 558. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5077 filed. S.J. 474. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 474. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Hogg, and Schultz. S.J. 443. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 414. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 414. |
2016-03-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 374. |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 2. H.J. 370. |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8041 withdrawn. H.J. 370. |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8018 adopted. H.J. 369. |
2016-03-01 | House | Amendments H-8025 and H-8013 withdrawn. H.J. 369. |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8041 filed. H.J. 349. |
2016-02-23 | House | Amendments H-8018 and H-8025 filed. H.J. 314. |
2016-02-22 | House | Amendment H-8013 filed. H.J. 289. |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 254. |