IA HF231 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between an emergency medical care provider and a patient. (See Cmte. Bill HF 448)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between an emergency medical care provider and a patient. (See Cmte. Bill HF 448)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 533. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee, Gustafson, Best, and McConkey. H.J. 313. |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 302. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HF231 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF231.html |