IA HF231 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public access to audio recordings of 911 telephone calls.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public access to audio recordings of 911 telephone calls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-17 | Subcommittee, Hagenow, Berry, and Fry. H.J. 364. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 294. |