IA HF2292 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 810.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 810.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confinement feeding operations confining fish, and making penalties applicable. Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to confinement feeding operations confining fish, and making penalties applicable. Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 810. | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 770. | |
2012-04-09 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 770. | |
2012-04-03 | Message from Senate. H.J. 729. | |
2012-04-03 | Immediate message. S.J. 715. | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 3. S.J. 714. | |
2012-04-03 | Senate concurred with S-5154. S.J. 714. | |
2012-03-29 | Message from House, with amendment S-5154. S.J. 690. | |
2012-03-28 | Immediate message. H.J. 692. | |
2012-03-28 | Passed House, ayes 94, nays 1. H.J. 688. | |
2012-03-28 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8370, as amended. H.J. 688. | |
2012-03-28 | Amendment H-8382 filed, adopted. H.J. 688. | |
2012-03-27 | Senate amendment H-8370 filed. H.J. 671. | |
2012-03-27 | Message from Senate. H.J. 656. | |
2012-03-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 672. | |
2012-03-27 | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 671. | |
2012-03-27 | Amendment S-5135 filed, adopted. S.J. 671. | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 647. | |
2012-03-15 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 576. | |
2012-03-06 | Read first time, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 463. | |
2012-03-06 | Message from House. S.J. 463. | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate message. H.J. 431. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 426. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment H-8071 withdrawn. H.J. 426. | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment H-8071 filed. H.J. 377. | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 260. |