IA HF2254 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the minimum school calendar requirements and the use of online learning by school districts and accredited nonpublic schools.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the minimum school calendar requirements and the use of online learning by school districts and accredited nonpublic schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 11:45AM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Cahill and Sorensen. H.J. 199. |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 187. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2254 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2254.html |