IA HF2245 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 754.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for the enactment of the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 588)
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for the enactment of the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 588)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 754. | |
2012-04-04 | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration.. H.J. 753. | |
2012-03-20 | Senate amendment H-8295 filed. H.J. 614. | |
2012-03-20 | Message from Senate. H.J. 585. | |
2012-03-19 | Immediate message. S.J. 591. | |
2012-03-19 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 588. | |
2012-03-19 | Amendment S-5053 adopted. S.J. 587. | |
2012-03-19 | Point of order raised on S-5053, ruled in order. S.J. 587. | |
2012-03-12 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment S-5053 filed. S.J. 492. | |
2012-03-07 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 492. | |
2012-02-15 | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Hamerlinck, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 263. | |
2012-02-14 | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 241. | |
2012-02-14 | Message from House. S.J. 241. | |
2012-02-13 | Immediate message. H.J. 256. | |
2012-02-13 | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 38. H.J. 255. | |
2012-03-12 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2012-02-13 | Amendment H-8011 out of order. H.J. 255. | |
2012-02-13 | Amendment H-8012 adopted. H.J. 255. | |
2012-02-10 | Amendment H-8012 filed. H.J. 250. | |
2012-02-09 | Amendment H-8011 filed. H.J. 247. | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 215. |