IA HF2236 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 652.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to service of process made on the commissioner of insurance as the agent or attorney for service of process for regulated individuals and entities and resolving inconsistencies. (Formerly HSB 582.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to service of process made on the commissioner of insurance as the agent or attorney for service of process for regulated individuals and entities and resolving inconsistencies. (Formerly HSB 582.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 652. |
2018-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 652. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 652. |
2018-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 580. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 666. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 663. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2248. S.J. 663. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2248. S.J. 410. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 410. |
2018-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2018-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 345. |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8061 withdrawn. H.J. 344. |
2018-02-21 | House | Point of order raised on H-8059, ruled not germane. H.J. 344. |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8066 out of order. H.J. 344. |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8066 filed. H.J. 344. |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8058 withdrawn. H.J. 344. |
2018-02-20 | House | Amendments H-8058, H-8059 and H-8061 filed. H.J. 329. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 203. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB582 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3130 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2248 (Similar To) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 664.
SSB3130 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2248 (Similar To) 2018-03-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 664.