IA HF2235 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statewide assessments of student progress for purposes of core academic indicators, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 578.) Effective 3-28-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to statewide assessments of student progress for purposes of core academic indicators, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 578.) Effective 3-28-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 700. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 689. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 742. |
2018-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 649. |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 86, nays 13. H.J. 648. |
2018-03-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8262. H.J. 647. |
2018-03-14 | House | Fiscal note, revised. |
2018-03-14 | House | Senate amendment H-8262 filed. H.J. 591. |
2018-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 580. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 666. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 10. S.J. 665. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5136 adopted. S.J. 664. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5136 filed. S.J. 645. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 594. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chelgren, Dvorsky, Quirmbach, Rozenboom, and Sinclair. S.J. 428. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 328. |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 3. H.J. 316. |
2018-02-07 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 202. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB578 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.