IA HF221 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for professional licensure, including licenses issued by the board of educational examiners to applicants from other states or countries.(See HF 614.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for professional licensure, including licenses issued by the board of educational examiners to applicants from other states or countries.(See HF 614.)
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 596. |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 614. |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 12:00PM RM 304. |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2023 12:00PM RM 304 (Cancelled). |
2023-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Cahill and Stone. H.J. 302. |
2023-02-08 | House | Rereferred to Education. H.J. 274. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 256. |
Same As/Similar To
HF614 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF221 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF221.html |