IA HF2206 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 395.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual termination of a human pregnancy, and providing penalties.(See HF 2372.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual termination of a human pregnancy, and providing penalties.(See HF 2372.)
Sponsors
Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] | Rep. Mary Wolfe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 395. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2372. |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 212. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 9:30AM RM 304. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Jones and Olson. H.J. 176. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 166. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2372 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 902.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2206 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2206.html |