IA HF2201 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to sexual orientation or gender identity instruction or related materials provided by school districts to pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to sexual orientation or gender identity instruction or related materials provided by school districts to pupils.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2020 4:00PM RM 19.
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee: Salmon, Moore, T. and Staed. H.J. 207.
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 177.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback