IA HF2198 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child care center minimum age requirements for employees and staff-to-children ratios, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 539.) Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/16/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to child care center minimum age requirements for employees and staff-to-children ratios, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 539.) Effective date: 07/01/2022, 06/16/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5130 to amendment S–5063 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5063 be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8118 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8117 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8027 be adopted? (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5130 to amendment S–5063 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5063 be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8118 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8117 be adopted? (Y: 40 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall amendment H–8027 be adopted? (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 943. |
2022-06-01 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 821. |
2022-04-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 861. |
2022-04-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 42. H.J. 860. |
2022-04-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8362. H.J. 860. |
2022-04-19 | House | Senate amendment H-8362 filed. H.J. 849. |
2022-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 849. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 772. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 772. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5063 adopted. S.J. 771. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5130 filed, lost. S.J. 770. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Amendment S-5063 filed. S.J. 546. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 546. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2022 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Jochum, and Rowley. S.J. 471. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 444. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 444. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 489. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 55, nays 43. H.J. 484. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8027, yeas 98, nays 0, adopted. H.J. 483. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8118, yeas 40, nays 58, lost. H.J. 482. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8117, yeas 40, nays 58, lost. H.J. 481. |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendments H-8117 and H-8118 filed. H.J. 441. |
2022-02-16 | House | Amendment H-8027 filed. H.J. 289. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB539 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2198.