IA HF2146 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the dispensing of lottery tickets and products by self-service kiosks, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-30-16.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the dispensing of lottery tickets and products by self-service kiosks, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-30-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 585. |
2016-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 563. |
2016-03-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 476. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 514. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 39, nays 10. S.J. 513. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 465. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Committee. S.J. 0. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee, McCoy, Bowman, and Chapman. S.J. 358. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 317. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 317. |
2016-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 283. |
2016-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 288. |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House, ayes 87, nays 10. H.J. 273. |
2016-02-18 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 156. |