IA HF2144 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to permissible forms of ownership of transmission facilities subject to a joint agreement for generating, purchasing, or otherwise acquiring electric power and energy. Effective 7-1-12.
Title
A bill for an act relating to permissible forms of ownership of transmission facilities subject to a joint agreement for generating, purchasing, or otherwise acquiring electric power and energy. Effective 7-1-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 764. | |
2012-04-03 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 732. | |
2012-04-03 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 732. | |
2012-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 632. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 636. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 636. | |
2012-02-22 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 311. | |
2012-02-14 | Subcommittee, Wilhelm, Feenstra, and Seng. S.J. 252. | |
2012-02-09 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 218. | |
2012-02-09 | Message from House. S.J. 218. | |
2012-02-08 | Immediate message. H.J. 229. | |
2012-02-08 | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 225. | |
2012-01-27 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 156. |