IA HF2125 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 12:00PM RM 304 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 12:00PM RM 304 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to college athletics by requiring a name, image, and likeness financial literacy course for college athletes, exempting certain net income received by college athletes from the individual income tax, and allowing for deductions from individual and corporate income taxes for contributions made to college athletic collectives, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to college athletics by requiring a name, image, and likeness financial literacy course for college athletes, exempting certain net income received by college athletes from the individual income tax, and allowing for deductions from individual and corporate income taxes for contributions made to college athletic collectives, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 12:00PM RM 304 (Cancelled). |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Stone, Cahill and Moore, T. H.J. 159. |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 127. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2125 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2125.html |