IA HF2118 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 512.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, requiring the removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 512.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 593. |
2018-02-05 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendments H-8002 and H-8003 filed. H.J. 164. |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 152. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB512 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3025 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
SSB3025 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2118 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2118.html |